Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039473

EP1039473 - Digital data recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
TOSHIBA VIDEO PRODUCTS JAPAN CO., LTD.
1-1-1, Shibaura, Minato-ku
Tokyo-to 105-8001 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kanai, Hirofumi
194-2 Okiai
Fukaya-shi, Saitama-ken 366-0837 / JP
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105916.122.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateJP1999007838823.03.1999         Original published format: JP 7838899
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039473
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039473
Date:07.02.2001
[2001/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11C7/16, G06F12/02
[2001/06]
Former International [2000/39]G11C7/16
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/43]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Digitaler Datenaufnahmeapparat[2000/39]
English:Digital data recording apparatus[2000/39]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement de donnée digital[2000/39]
Examination procedure22.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
13.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/15]
02.11.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19633648  (GRUNDIG AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 52-66 * * column 4, lines 55-65 *;
 [A]US5337275  (GARNER RICHARD P [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *