Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041718

EP1041718 - A low power adjustable input threshold circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way
Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/44]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999
Dallas, Texas 75251 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Yaklin, Daniel A.
2525 Creighton Drive
Garland, Texas 75044 / US
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Degwert, Hartmut , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
Former [2003/12]Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Former [2000/40]Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing.
Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date00105976.524.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateUS1999028043129.03.1999         Original published format: US 280431
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1041718
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1041718
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041718
Date:02.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H03K17/30
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/01]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Leistungsarme einstellbare Schwellwert-Schaltung[2000/40]
English:A low power adjustable input threshold circuit[2000/40]
French:Circuit à seuil adjustable de basse puissance[2000/40]
Examination procedure09.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
07.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2006Fee for grant paid
15.09.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
17.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.11.2006
NL02.11.2006
[2007/35]
Former [2007/19]NL02.11.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US5477142  (GOOD BRIAN K [US], et al) [A] 1-4;
 [A]US4479266  (EUMURIAN GREGOIRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-4;
 [A]US4717839  (MILLER IRA [US]) [A] 1-4