Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052156

EP1052156 - Centering device for automatic electrical couplings of railway vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 21.02.2007  [2007/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH
Moosacher Strasse 80
80809 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Czink, Othmar
Fastlinger Ring 210
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
[2000/46]
Application number, filing date00105995.527.03.2000
[2000/46]
Priority number, dateDE199912150810.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19921508
[2000/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052156
Date:15.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052156
Date:30.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:B61G5/06, B61G5/10
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/46]
TitleGerman:Zentriervorrichtung zur Aufnahme einer Elektrokupplung einer automatischen Zugkupplung[2000/46]
English:Centering device for automatic electrical couplings of railway vehicles[2000/46]
French:Dispositif de centrage pour attelages automatiques des véhicules ferroviaires[2000/46]
Examination procedure15.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/28]
11.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2003Fee for grant paid
26.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY30.07.2003
FI30.07.2003
GB30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
[2007/08]
Former [2005/21]FI30.07.2003
GB30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
CH31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/02]FI30.07.2003
GB30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
MC31.03.2004
Former [2004/46]FI30.07.2003
GB30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
ES10.11.2003
PT30.12.2003
Former [2004/45]FI30.07.2003
GB30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
Former [2004/31]FI30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
PT30.12.2003
Former [2004/29]FI30.07.2003
IE30.07.2003
DK30.10.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/16]FI30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
SE30.10.2003
Former [2004/14]FI30.07.2003
GR30.10.2003
Former [2004/12]FI30.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1255216  (MINI VERKEHRSWESEN [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0808760  (SCHARFENBERGKUPPLUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,11-14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4232793  (HALLAM KEITH J, et al) [X] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 8; figure - *