Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040908

EP1040908 - Supply method of belt member [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  10.07.2009
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.07.2009Opposition rejectedpublished on 12.08.2009  [2009/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
THE YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO., LTD.
36-11, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okada, Noboru, The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd.
Hiratsuka Factory, 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Hasegawa, Haruhisa, The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd.
Hiratsuka Factory, 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Take, Toshihiko, The Yokohama Rubber Co., Ltd.
Hiratsuka Factory, 2-1, Oiwake
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106077.130.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999008800530.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8800599
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1040908
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1040908
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040908
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/38
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2002/04]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Zuführen von Gürtellagen[2000/40]
English:Supply method of belt member[2000/40]
French:Procédé pour l'alimentation de nappes d'armature[2000/40]
Examination procedure15.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/33]
02.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2004Fee for grant paid
26.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04003396.1  / EP1419877
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.02.2005  01.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
VMI Epe Holland B.V.
P.O. Box 161
8160 AD EPE / NL
Opponent's representative
De Hoop, Eric
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V.
Koninginnegracht 19
2514 AB Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2005/15]
Opponent(s)01  18.02.2005  01.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
VMI Epe Holland B.V.
P.O. Box 161
8160 AD EPE / NL
Opponent's representative
De Hoop, Eric
Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. P.O. Box 266
2501 AW The Hague / NL
29.03.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.07.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.12.2006Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
02.07.2009Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2009/33]
Appeal following opposition29.01.2007Appeal received No.  T0181/07
30.03.2007Statement of grounds filed
20.05.2009Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XPA]EP0904959  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-3 [AP] 4-9;
 [A]GB1348254  (STEELASTIC CO) [A] 1,4,7;
 [A]EP0714758  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,7;
 [A]US4875959  (KUMAGAI YUZO [JP]) [A] 1,4,7;
 [A]US3898116  (KATAGIRI YOSHIAKI, et al) [A] 1,4,7