Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1039086

EP1039086 - Arrangement of a carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2008Change - representativepublished on 16.07.2008  [2008/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Riedmaier, Helmut
Kleebachstrasse 4
83233 Weisham / DE
[2005/22]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Riedmaier, Helmut
kleebachstrasse 4
83233 Weisham / DE
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patentanwälte PartmbB
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR
Postfach 31 02 20
80102 München / DE
Former [2000/39]Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner
Postfach 22 16 11
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106147.221.03.2000
[2000/39]
Priority number, dateDE199911337924.03.1999         Original published format: DE 19913379
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1039086
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
[2000/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1039086
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1039086
Date:01.06.2005
Language:DE
[2005/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:E06B1/56
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   LI,   NL [2001/29]
Former [2001/26]
Former [2000/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Trägeranordnung[2000/39]
English:Arrangement of a carrier[2000/39]
French:Arrangement d'un porteur[2000/39]
Examination procedure10.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/29]
07.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2005Fee for grant paid
01.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21]
Request for further processing for:04.06.2004Request for further processing filed
04.06.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.06.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL01.06.2005
[2006/22]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0207476  (ZIMMERMANN FRIEDEL) [A] 1;
 [A]DE19816854  (BIFFAR KG OSKAR D [DE]) [A] 1