Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055772

EP1055772 - Method for producing components for the mechanical processing of aqueous papermaking pulp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.10.2006
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.11.2006  [2006/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
St. Pöltener Str. 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/37]For all designated states
Voith Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2005/49]For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
Voith Paper Patent GmbH
Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43
89522 Heidenheim / DE
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH
Postfach 2120
88191 Ravensburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kleinschnittger, Hans Herrmann
Feuchtmayrstrasse 12
88250 Weingarten / DE
02 / Schneid, Josef
Rutteshalde 6
88267 Vogt / DE
[2000/48]
Application number, filing date00106187.822.03.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateDE199912386525.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19923865
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055772
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055772
Date:07.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:D21D1/30
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FI,   FR,   GB [2001/33]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Garnituren für das mechanische Bearbeiten von wasserhaltigem Papierfaserstoff[2000/48]
English:Method for producing components for the mechanical processing of aqueous papermaking pulp[2000/48]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication des garnitures pour le traitement méchanique de la pâte à papier aqueuse[2000/48]
Examination procedure29.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/30]
17.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2005Fee for grant paid
01.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE19603548  (VOITH SULZER STOFFAUFBEREITUNG [DE]) [DA] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5580472  (MAYBON GUY [FR]) [A] 1 * column A; figure -; claim - *