Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050447

EP1050447 - Motor vehicle with a mounting box on the bulkhead between engine space and passenger compartment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft
38436 Wolfsburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hoffmann, Bernd
Waterloostrasse 19
38106 Braunschweig / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00106203.322.03.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateDE199912023503.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19920235
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1050447
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1050447
Date:11.09.2002
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/08
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/22]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kraftfahrzeug mit einem Montagekasten an einer Stirnwand zwischen Motorraum und Fahrgastzelle[2000/45]
English:Motor vehicle with a mounting box on the bulkhead between engine space and passenger compartment[2000/45]
French:Véhicule à moteur avec boîte de montage sur la cloison séparant les compartiments moteur et passagers[2000/45]
Examination procedure22.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/04]
06.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/53]
30.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/53]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19524175  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE19524165  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 31 - line 38; figure .; claim 9 *;
 [E]EP0992420  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [E] 1,3,4,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9211167  (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9601761  (OPEL ADAM AG [DE], et al);
 [A]EP0304366  (ECIA EQUIP COMPOSANTS IND AUTO [FR])