blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1050447


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.11.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  29.12.2004  [2004/53]
27.07.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
13.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.02.2004 Deletion: Reply to examination report
10.09.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.08.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
13.08.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
12.07.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.04.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  28.05.2003  [2003/22]
09.04.2003 Renewal fee
07.03.2003 First examination report
03.03.2003 Examination report or reply
06.12.2002 Request for examination filed published on  22.01.2003  [2003/04]
26.07.2002 Publication of search report published on  11.09.2002  [2002/37]
22.04.2002 Renewal fee
22.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.11.2000 [2000/45]