blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1050447
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1050447Global Dossier 11.09.2002A3
EP1050447 08.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19920235 03.05.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19920235 24.04.2008B4
DE19920235 09.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19920235 03.05.1999