Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045046

EP1045046 - Process for manufacturing a quartz glass crucible [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/42]Quartz glass crucible and process for its manufacture
[2004/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2006
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.05.2006  [2006/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heraeus Quarzglas GmbH & Co. KG
Quarzstrasse
63450 Hanau / DE
[2000/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Fabian, Heinz
Westring 29
63792 Grossostheim / DE
02 / Arndt, Martin, Dr.
Fritz-Reuter-Strasse 11
06749 Bitterfeld / DE
03 / Leist, Johann
Breite Schneise 13
63674 Altenstadt / DE
04 / Gertig, Udo
Am Wingert 50
63867 Johannesberg / DE
05 / Englisch, Wolfgang, Dr.
Hölderlinstrasse 54
65779 Kelkheim / DE
[2000/42]
Application number, filing date00106234.822.03.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateDE199911728816.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19917288
[2000/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1045046
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1045046
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045046
Date:25.05.2005
Language:DE
[2005/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:C30B15/10, C30B35/00, C03C15/00, C03B19/09, C03C19/00, C03B23/00
[2001/20]
Former International [2000/42]C30B15/10, C30B35/00, C03C15/00, C03B19/09
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/07]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Herstellungsverfahren für einen Quarzglas-Tiegel[2004/41]
English:Process for manufacturing a quartz glass crucible[2004/41]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un creuset en verre de quartz[2004/41]
Former [2000/42]Quarzglas-Tiegel und Herstellungsverfahren dafür
Former [2000/42]Quartz glass crucible and process for its manufacture
Former [2000/42]Creuset en verre de quartz et procédé de sa fabrication
Examination procedure31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
12.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2005Fee for grant paid
09.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
08.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4528163  (ALBRECHT HORST [DE]) [DA] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [DA]DE19713014  (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) [DA] 1,9 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0338914  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1,9 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]JPH07196397  ;
 [A]JPH02188489
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 199, no. 511, [A] 1,9 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901004), vol. 14, no. 459, [A] 1,9 * abstract *