Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044634

EP1044634 - Arm support for a chair [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SDM HANSEN AG
Hauptstrasse 174 b
9430 St. Margrethen / CH
[2000/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Hansen, Eckhard, Dipl.-Ing.
Hauptstrasse 176
9430 St. Margrethen / CH
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria
C/o Bugnion S.p.A.
Via Dante 17
25122 Brescia / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Ghioni, Carlo Raoul Maria
c/o Bugnion S.p.A., Via Dante 17
25122 Brescia / IT
Application number, filing date00106290.023.03.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateAT1999000063612.04.1999         Original published format: AT 63699
[2000/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044634
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1044634
Date:03.12.2003
Language:EN
[2003/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/03
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:Armstütze für einen Stuhl[2000/42]
English:Arm support for a chair[2000/42]
French:Accoudoir pour chaise[2000/42]
Examination procedure29.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
06.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2003Fee for grant paid
30.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
CY03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
FR03.12.2003
IT03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
GB23.03.2004
IE23.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
PT03.05.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
CY03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
FR03.12.2003
IT03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
GB23.03.2004
IE23.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2007/08]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
CY03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
FR03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
GB23.03.2004
IE23.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2006/14]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
FR03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
GB23.03.2004
IE23.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/45]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
GB23.03.2004
IE23.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/24]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
IE23.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/23]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
LU23.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/12]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
DE04.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2005/02]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
DK03.03.2004
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
MC31.03.2004
Former [2004/52]AT03.12.2003
BE03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/46]AT03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
ES14.03.2004
Former [2004/33]AT03.12.2003
CH03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
LI03.12.2003
NL03.12.2003
GR03.03.2004
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/31]AT03.12.2003
FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/26]FI03.12.2003
SE03.03.2004
Former [2004/24]SE03.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5876097  (CAO ZI-WEN [TW]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US5586811  (TORNERO LINO E [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US4961610  (REEDER RYAN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]US5382079  (WILSON ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 9 * figure - *
by applicantDE4415264
 DE4317610
 DE29511267U
 DE29502429U
 DE29519794U
 DE8814053U
 DE8716965U
 US5407249