Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055840

EP1055840 - Switchable liquid-filled vibration isolating mount [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO., LTD .
17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishiku
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO., LTD .
17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishiku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takashima, Yukio, c/o Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd.
17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishiku
Osaka / JP
02 / Takaoka, Masashi, c/o Toyo Tire & Rubber Co., Ltd.
17-18, Edobori 1-chome, Nishiku
Osaka / JP
[2000/48]
Representative(s)Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois , et al
TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106316.323.03.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateJP1999014814627.05.1999         Original published format: JP 14814699
[2000/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1055840
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1055840
Date:23.04.2003
[2003/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055840
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:F16F13/26
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/48]
TitleGerman:Schaltbares flüssigkeitsgefülltes schwingungsisolierendes lager[2000/48]
English:Switchable liquid-filled vibration isolating mount[2000/48]
French:Support isolateur de vibration rempli de fluide et commutable[2000/48]
Examination procedure10.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
20.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2004Fee for grant paid
05.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
FR02.06.2004
IT02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
NL02.06.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
PT02.11.2004
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
FR02.06.2004
IT02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
NL02.06.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2006/14]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
FR02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
NL02.06.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2006/13]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
NL02.06.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
DK02.09.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT02.06.2004
BE02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT02.06.2004
CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
GR02.09.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH02.06.2004
FI02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
SE02.09.2004
ES13.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
SE02.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH02.06.2004
LI02.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0886080  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1-11 * column 4 - column 5; figure 1 *;
 [DA]JPH10238586  ;
 [DA]JPH10184777  ;
 [DA]JPH08270718  ;
 [A]JPH09222148  ;
 [A]EP0821181  (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 11 * figure 1 *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [DA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, [DA] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971225), vol. 1997, no. 12, [A] 8,9 * abstract *
by applicantJPH08270718
 JPH10238586
 JPH10184777