Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055503

EP1055503 - Extrusion head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher
Münsterstrasse 50
D-49525 Lengerich / DE
[2000/48]
Inventor(s)01 / Linkies, Jürgen
Feldbreede 7
49536 Lienen / DE
02 / Beckmann, Hans-Udo
Bachstrasse 16
58509 Lüdenscheid / DE
03 / aus dem Moore, Dieter
Zur Haar 14
48477 Hörstel / DE
[2000/48]
Application number, filing date00106368.424.03.2000
[2000/48]
Priority number, dateDE199912454028.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19924540
[2000/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1055503
Date:29.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1055503
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055503
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/20, B29C55/28, // B29L7:00
[2000/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/34]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Extruderdüsenkopf[2000/48]
English:Extrusion head[2000/48]
French:Tête d'extrusion[2000/48]
Examination procedure06.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/31]
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2002Fee for grant paid
15.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS6367133  ;
 [A]US3343214  (MYERS JOHN H) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE1139970  (TROESTER MASCHF PAUL) [A] * figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880808), vol. 012, no. 289, Database accession no. (M - 728), & JP63067133 A 19880325 (TOMY KIKAI KOGYO KK) [A] 1-9 * abstract *