blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1046602 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1046602



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 69
06.04.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
23.07.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.07.2004 Request for change of name Search / examination 1
02.07.2004 Request for change of name Search / examination 1
22.04.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.03.2004 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
21.01.2004 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
08.01.2004 Description Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Description Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.01.2004 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 2
08.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
08.01.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.11.2003 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.10.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 8
01.07.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.05.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
13.05.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.05.2002 European search report Search / examination 1
23.10.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.10.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 4
13.09.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
09.05.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
09.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 9
24.03.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.03.2000 Claims Search / examination 2
24.03.2000 Description Search / examination 4
24.03.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.2000 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.03.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6