blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1046602


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.04.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.05.2005  [2005/21]
23.07.2004 Change - applicant published on  08.09.2004  [2004/37]
16.04.2004 (Expected) grant published on  02.06.2004  [2004/23]
13.04.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.03.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.03.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.01.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.11.2003 Change - inventor published on  07.01.2004  [2004/02]
07.10.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.05.2003 Change - extension states
09.04.2003 Renewal fee
31.01.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
17.01.2003 Request for examination filed published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
09.05.2002 Publication of search report published on  26.06.2002  [2002/26]
05.04.2002 Renewal fee
19.10.2001 Change - applicant published on  05.12.2001 [2001/49]
08.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.2000 [2000/43]