blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1046602
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50006651D 08.07.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999
DE50006651 24.03.2000
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000327184Global Dossier 28.11.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1046602Global Dossier 02.06.2004B1
EP1046602 26.06.2002A3
EP1046602 25.10.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2303706 09.10.2007C
CA2303706 22.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19918220 24.10.2002C2
DE19918220 02.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2220282T 16.12.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6582547 24.06.2003B1
Priority number Date
DE19918220 22.04.1999