Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046602

EP1046602 - Method for the preparation of a splice [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.2005  [2005/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
tesa AG
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
[2004/37]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Tesa AG
Quickbornstrasse 24
20253 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Gebbeken, Bernhard
Haakestrasse 72
21075 Hamburg / DE
02 / Gassner, Thomas
Im Winkel 2
D-25436 Heidgraben / DE
03 / Aster, Günter
Kösliner Strasse 44
22147 Hamburg / DE
 [2004/02]
Former [2000/43]01 / Gebbeken, Bernhard
Haakestrasse 72
21075 Hamburg / DE
02 / Gassner, Thomas
Martin-Luther-Strasse 23
20459 Hamburg / DE
03 / Aster, Günter
Kösliner Strasse 44
22147 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00106378.324.03.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateDE199911822022.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19918220
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046602
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1046602
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046602
Date:02.06.2004
Language:DE
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B65H19/18, B65H19/10
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/12]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Splice-Vorbereitung[2000/43]
English:Method for the preparation of a splice[2000/43]
French:Procédé de préparation d'une épissure[2000/43]
Examination procedure27.12.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
16.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2004Fee for grant paid
26.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5322230  (DYLLA NORBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 22 - column 3, line 68; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US4802632  (FUKUDA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 18; figures 13-20 *