blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1041514

EP1041514 - Method and apparatus for selectively displaying measurement result and corresponding images [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.02.2007  [2007/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[2006/09]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd.
210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shibata, Hiromi
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 258 / JP
02 / Ogura, Nobuhiko
Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi
Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken 258 / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Winzererstrasse 106
80797 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106728.929.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999008935530.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8935599
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1041514
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1041514
Date:17.09.2003
[2003/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041514
Date:01.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.08.2003
ClassificationIPC:G06T11/20, G06F19/00, G06F17/30
[2003/38]
CPC:
G06T11/20 (EP,US); B01J2219/00585 (EP,US); B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US); B01J2219/00608 (EP,US); B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00707 (EP,US); B01J2219/00722 (EP,US); C40B40/06 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/40]G06T11/20, G06F19/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   SE [2004/24]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur selektiven Anzeige von Ergebnissen und übereinstimmenden Bildern[2000/40]
English:Method and apparatus for selectively displaying measurement result and corresponding images[2000/40]
French:Méthode et appareil pour afficher sélectivement des résultats de mesures et les images correspondantes[2000/40]
Examination procedure02.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
18.03.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2005Fee for grant paid
20.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.04.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.04.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US5682441  (LIGTENBERG ADRIANUS [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * column 1, line 15 - line 19 * * column 2, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 25 - line 39 *;
 [A]  - MARSHALL A ET AL, "DNA CHIPS: AN ARRAY OF POSSIBILITIES", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING, US, (1998), vol. 16, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 27 - 31, XP000198576 [A] 1-28 * page 27 - page 31 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0198-27
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.