Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041508

EP1041508 - Image forming apparatus having data compression/decompression system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.11.2009
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.12.2009  [2009/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
For all designated states
Casio Electronics Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
4084, Miyadera Iruma-shi
Saitama-ken 358-0014 / JP
[2009/03]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8543 / JP
For all designated states
Casio Electronics Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
4084, Miyadera
Iruma-shi, Saitama-ken 358-0014 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Takeo, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd.
IPC., Hamura R & D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome
Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106759.429.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999009466901.04.1999         Original published format: JP 9466999
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1041508
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1041508
Date:13.12.2000
[2000/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041508
Date:14.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K15/02, G06K15/00
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/40]G06K15/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/36]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bilderzeugungsgerät mit einem System zur Datenkompression und -dekompression[2008/33]
English:Image forming apparatus having data compression/decompression system[2000/40]
French:Appareil de formation d'images comprenant un système de compression et décompression de données[2000/40]
Former [2000/40]Bilderzeugungsgerät das ein System für Datenkompression und -dekompression umfasst
Examination procedure29.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
05.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2008Fee for grant paid
02.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0465943  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,15 * column 6, lines 10-50 * * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 43; figures 1,5,9C; claims 8,9 * [A] 16;
 [XA]EP0843279  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,15 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 4; figures 2,8-11 * * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 29 * [A] 16