Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1139232

EP1139232 - Cache time determination [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INTERSHOP Software Entwicklungs GmbH
Intershop Tower
07740 Jena / DE
[2001/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Mallwitz, Christian
Naumannstr. 9
07743 Jena / DE
02 / Gessner, Frank
Frommannstr. 7
07743 Jena / DE
03 / Schambach, Stephan
c/o Intershop SWE GmbH Intershop Tower
07740 Jena / DE
04 / Müller, Ulrike
Rathausgasse 2
07743 Jena / DE
05 / Sarnoch, Roy
Loderstrasse 2
07743 Jena / DE
 [2002/19]
Former [2001/40]01 / Nowotny, Marcus
Petersburger Strasse 49
10249 Berlin / DE
02 / Doubleday, Daniel
Schröderstrasse 10
10115 Berlin / DE
03 / Schultz, Daniel
Fanningerstrasse 71
10365 Berlin / DE
04 / Fassauer, Roland
Kanalstrasse 34c
22085 Hamburg / DE
05 / Müller, Ulrike
Rathausgasse 2
07743 Jena / DE
06 / Sarnoch, Roy
Loderstrasse 2
07743 Jena / DE
Representative(s)Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/40]Betten & Resch
Postfach 10 02 51
80076 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106827.930.03.2000
[2001/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1139232
Date:04.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1139232
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2001/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/26]
Former [2001/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bestimmung der Cachezeit[2001/40]
English:Cache time determination[2001/40]
French:Détermination du temps de mémorisation en antémémoire[2001/40]
Examination procedure19.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/40]
24.07.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
12.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2002Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.04.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
03.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.03.2003Fee for grant paid
31.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.05.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.05.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5787471  (INOUE SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10,20-29,37 * abstract * * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 3 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 54 * * column 9, line 43 - column 10, line 17 *;
 [A]WO9905619  (ICON CMT CORP [US]) [A] 1-38 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 20 *;
 [X]  - COHEN E ET AL, "Exploiting regularities in Web traffic patterns for cache replacement", PROCEEDINGS OF THE THIRTY-FIRST ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON THEORY OF COMPUTING, PROCEEDINGS OF STOC 99: 31ST ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON THEORY OF COMPUTING, ATLANTA, GA, USA, 1-4 MAY 1999, 1999, New York, NY, USA, ACM, USA, ISBN 1-58113-067-8, pages 109 - 118, XP002162123 [X] 1,3-6,8,10,11,20-29,31,34-37 * page 110, column L, paragraph 3 - page 110, column R, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/301250.301281
 [A]  - DOUGLIS F ET AL, "HPP: HTML macro-preprocessing to support dynamic document caching", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX SYMPOSIUM ON INTERNET TECHNOLOGIES AND SYSTEMS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX SYMPOSIUM ON INTERNET TECHNOLOGIES AND SYSTEMS, MONTEREY, CA, USA, 8-11 DEC. 1997, 1997, Berkeley, CA, USA, USENIX Assoc, USA, ISBN 1-880446-91-X, pages 83 - 94, XP002162124 [A] 1-38 * page 2, column L, line 22 - page 2, column R, line 1 *
 [A]  - CAO P ET AL, "Cost-aware WWW proxy caching algorithms", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX SYMPOSIUM ON INTERNET TECHNOLOGIES AND SYSTEMS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX SYMPOSIUM ON INTERNET TECHNOLOGIES AND SYSTEMS, MONTEREY, CA, USA, 8-11 DEC. 1997, 1997, Berkeley, CA, USA, USENIX Assoc, USA, ISBN 1-880446-91-X, pages 193 - 206, XP002162125 [A] 1-38 * page 6, column L, paragraph 3 - page 6, column R, paragraph 4 *