Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040833

EP1040833 - Bone resorption suppressing agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Snow Brand Milk Products Co., Ltd.
1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi
Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS, CO., LTD.
1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku Sapporo-shi
Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS, CO., LTD.
1-1 Naebocho 6-chome Higashi-ku
Sapporo-shi Hokkaido 065-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takada, Yukihiro
62-22, Kozutsumi Kawagoe-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Serizawa, Atsushi
4-1-704,Minamidai 3-chome Kawagoe-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Ishikawa, Hidetoshi
8-3,Maedasanjo 3-chome Teine-ku
Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do / JP
04 / Yoshioka, Tomoe
59-30, Miharashidai Ebetsu-shi
Hokkai-do / JP
05 / Aoe, Seiichiro
8-9-406, Shinsayama Sayama-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
 [2005/39]
Former [2000/40]01 / Takada, Yukihiro
62-22, Kozutsumi Kawagoe-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Serizawa, Atushi
4-1-704,Minamidai 3-chome Kawagoe-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Ishikawa, Hidetoshi
8-3,Maedasanjo 3-chome Teine-ku
Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do / JP
04 / Yoshioka, Tomoe
59-30, Mihirashidai Ebetsu-shi
Hokkai-do / JP
05 / Aoe, Seiichiro
8-9-406, Shinsayama Sayama-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/40]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106844.430.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999008994630.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8994699
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040833
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040833
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/20, A61P19/08
[2005/19]
Former International [2000/40]A61K35/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:Mittel zur Unterdrückung der Knochenresorption[2000/40]
English:Bone resorption suppressing agent[2000/40]
French:Agent pour l'inhibition de la résorption osseuse[2000/40]
Examination procedure04.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
15.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2005Fee for grant paid
03.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY16.11.2005
GR16.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2007/45]GR16.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2007/35]IT16.11.2005
GR16.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/46]GR16.02.2006
MC31.03.2006
Former [2006/38]GR16.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH072896  ;
 [X]JPH1080281  ;
 [Y]EP0373771  (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 *cf. abstract, page 2, lines 29-34, lines 46-50*;
 [A]WO9714797  (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [A] 1-6 *cf. abstract, p. 2, last para. "summary of the invention", bridging with page 3, lines 1-24*
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 11, Database accession no. 1995-078031, XP002144179 & JPH072896 A 19950106 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 23, Database accession no. 1998-254408, XP002144180 & JPH1080281 A 19980331 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - ABRAHAMSON M., ET AL., "Isolation of six cysteine proteinase inhibitors from human urine. Their physicochemical and enzyme kinetic properties and concentrations in biological fluids.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 261, no. 24, pages 11282 - 11289, XP000917319 [Y] 1-6 *cf. abstract, page 11286, table V and left col., 3rd para.*