Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041677

EP1041677 - Connector engaging/disengaging device accommodating a plurality of connector pairs to mate with each other [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.11.2003  [2003/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY, LIMITED
21-6, Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
JAPAN AVIATION ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY, LIMITED
21-6, Dogenzaka 1-chome
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hashiguchi, Osamu, c/o Japan Aviat.Elec. Ind. Ltd
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Mizusawa, Yoshinori, c/o Japan Aviat.Elec.Ind. Ltd
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Maeda, Toshihiko, c/o Japan Aviat.Elec.Ind. Ltd
21-2, Dogenzaka 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Yamada, Masahiro
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Kamiyamane, Shin
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
06 / Nagase, Satoru
NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Hofer, Dorothea , et al
Prüfer & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Hofer, Dorothea , et al
Prüfer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25 d
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106873.330.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999008848330.03.1999         Original published format: JP 8848399
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1041677
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041677
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/518
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   NL [2001/25]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Fixieren/Lösen von Verbindern mit einer Vielzahl zueinander passenden Verbinderpaaren[2000/40]
English:Connector engaging/disengaging device accommodating a plurality of connector pairs to mate with each other[2000/40]
French:Dispositif pour l'engagement/désengagement de connecteurs, avec plusieurs paires des connecteurs s'interconnectant entre eux[2000/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
04.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
21.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2002Fee for grant paid
06.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US4682833  (FERCHAU JOERG U [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 54-69 - column 2, lines 1-5; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE29822734U  (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 4-10 * figure 3; claim 1 *