Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043157

EP1043157 - An integrated system for evaluating the residual solvent contained in packaging films during the printing process at the manufacturing plants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.08.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CERUTTI SPIRITO IMPIANTI S.R.L.
S.S. 31, Km 21 + 150
15030 VILLANOVA MONFERRATO (AL) / IT
[2000/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Cerutti, Roberto
Regione Ronchi No. 205 Frazione San Maurizio
I-15030 Conzano Monferrato / IT
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
Interpatent S.R.L.
Via Caboto, 35
10129 Torino / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]Robba, Pierpaolo , et al
Interpatent, Via Caboto 35
10129 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date00106883.231.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateIT1999TO0026202.04.1999         Original published format: IT TO990262
[2000/41]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043157
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043157
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B41F33/00, G01N1/04
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/41]B41F33/00
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/04]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ein integriertes System für das Auswerten des Restlösungsmittels enthalten in Verpackungsfilmen während des Druckprozesses in den Produktionsanlagen[2000/41]
English:An integrated system for evaluating the residual solvent contained in packaging films during the printing process at the manufacturing plants[2000/41]
French:Un système intégré pour évaluer le dissolvant résiduel contenu en films d' empaquetage pendant le processus d' impression aux usines[2000/41]
Examination procedure03.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/42]
16.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2002/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.01.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.01.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.01.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200203   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE4442240  (FOGRA FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT D [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-16;
 [YA]US5792423  (MARKELOV MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-16;
 [PA]WO9939175  (ZESIGER THIERRY [CH]) [PA] 1,10-16 * abstract *;
 [A]US2519159  (TALBOT HOWARD H) [A] 2-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4577516  (WYSER JOHANN [CH]) [A] 2-9 * the whole document *