Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1043779

EP1043779 - Thin film solar battery and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.03.2006
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.03.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.05.2006  [2006/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizuno, Shinichi, c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/41]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106933.531.03.2000
[2000/41]
Priority number, dateJP1999009769605.04.1999         Original published format: JP 9769699
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1043779
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1043779
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/0216, H01L31/052
[2001/18]
Former International [2000/41]H01L31/0392, H01L31/0216
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/04]
Former [2000/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dünnschicht-Solarzelle und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[2000/41]
English:Thin film solar battery and method of manufacturing the same[2000/41]
French:Cellule solaire à couche mince et sa méthode de fabrication[2000/41]
Examination procedure04.10.2001Examination requested  [2001/48]
15.03.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4419533  (CZUBATYJ WOLODYMYR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10 * figures 6,8,10 * * column 5, line 59 - column 7, line 18 * * column 14, line 32 - column 15, line 37 * * column 16, line 4 - line 31 * * column 17, line 34 - line 51 * [A] 3-5,11;
 [XA]US3973994  (REDFIELD DAVID) [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 38 * [A] 3,4,11;
 [XA]WO9214270  (INDUSTRIEORIENTIERTE FORSCH [CH]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10 * figures 2B,4-6 * * page 8, line 20 - page 10, line 17 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 34 * [A] 3-5,11;
 [A]EP0297437  (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]) [A] 3,4,11 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 16 - line 51 *;
 [A]WO9909601  (DAYSTAR TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4 * figures 1,4-7 * * page 6, line 27 - page 10, line 29 * * page 11, line 7 - page 16, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0175460  (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 3,4,11 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 14 - page 2, line 32 * * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 25 *;
 [A]DE4033545  (FLACHGLAS AG [DE]) [A] 5 * figure FIGURE * * column 2, line 5 - line 68 * * column 4, line 14 - line 28 *