Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1041772

EP1041772 - Packet switch realizing transmission with no packet delay [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.2008
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/20]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Aramaki, Toshiya, c/o NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Isoyama, Kazuhiko c/o NEC Corporation
7-1 Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/40]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00106950.931.03.2000
[2000/40]
Priority number, dateJP1999009699602.04.1999         Original published format: JP 9699699
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1041772
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1041772
Date:09.02.2005
[2005/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1041772
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2005/43]
Former [2000/40]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Paketvermittlungseinrichtung zur Paketübertragung ohne Verzögerung[2000/40]
English:Packet switch realizing transmission with no packet delay[2000/40]
French:Commutateur de pacquets pour transmission de pacquets sans retard[2000/40]
Examination procedure05.01.2005Examination requested  [2005/10]
04.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2007Fee for grant paid
16.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDE17.08.2007
[2008/24]
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO9907180  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1 * page 7, line 12 - page 12, line 9 * [A] 2-14;
 [A]US5390174  (JUGEL ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 20 - line 68 * * column 5, line 15 - line 33 *;
 [A]US5317561  (FISCHER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 7, line 12 - line 23 *