Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1022910

EP1022910 - Method and apparatus for moving an object image grid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/30]Method and apparatus for moving an object image grid, and motion estimation method and apparatus
[2002/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.12.2003
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.01.2004  [2004/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hyundai Curitel, Inc.
San 136-1, Ami-ri, Bubal-eub, Ichon-shi
Kyoungki-do / KR
[2001/42]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Hynix Semiconductor Inc.
San 136-1, Ami-ri, Pubal-eup
Ichon-shi, Kyonggi-do / KR
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
Hyundai Electronics Industries Co., Ltd.
San 136-1, Ami-ri, Pubal-eup
Ichon-kun, Kyounki-do 467-860 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Chun, Sung-Moon
1-104, Daelim Apt., Yungbong-dong, Songdong-gu
Seoul 133-080 / KR
02 / Park, Gwang-Hoon
411-93, Dohwa-dong, Nam-gu
Inch'on-shi, 402-060 / KR
03 / Moon, Joo-Hee
602 304, Hyundai Apt., 610, Kuui 3-dong
Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 133-200 / KR
04 / Kim, Jae-Kyoon
B-202, Sang-a Villa, 47-20, Samsung-dong
Kangnam-gu, Seoul, 135-090 / KR
05 / Yoo, Kuk-Yeol
LG Village Apt.402-604 Gumgok-dong
Kwonseon-gu Kyongki-do / KR
 [2003/04]
Former [2000/48]01 / Chun, Sung-Moon
1-104, Daelim Apt., Yungbong-dong, Songdon-gu
Seoul 133-080 / KR
02 / Park, Gwang-Hoon
411-93, Dohwa-dong, Nam-gu
Inch'on-shi, 402-060 / KR
03 / Moon, Joo-Hee
602 304, Hyundai Apt., 610, Kuui 3-dong
Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 133-200 / KR
04 / Kim, Jae-Kyoon
B-202, Sang-a Villa, 47-20, Samsung-dong
Kangnam-gu, Seoul, 135-090 / KR
05 / Yoo, Kuk-Yeol
I.G Village Apt.402-604 Gumgok-dong
Kwonseon-gu Kyongki-do / KR
Former [2000/30]01 / Chun, Sung-Moon
1-104, Daelim Apt., Yungbong-dong, Songdon-gu
Seoul 133-080 / KR
02 / Park, Gwang-Hoon
411-93, Dohwa-dong, Nam-gu
Inch'on-shi, 402-060 / KR
03 / Moon, Joo-Hee
602 304, Hyundai Apt., 610, Kuui 3-dong
Kwangjin-gu, Seoul, 133-200 / KR
04 / Kim, Jae-Kyoon
B-202, Sang-a Villa, 47-20, Samsung-dong
Kangnam-gu, Seoul, 135-090 / KR
05 / Yoo, Kuk-Yeol
373-1, Kusong-dong, Yusong-gu
Taejon-shi, 305-338 / KR
Representative(s)Collingwood, Anthony Robert , et al
Marks & Clerk Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester, M2 3LG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Collingwood, Anthony Robert , et al
McNeight & Lawrence, Regent House Heaton Lane
Stockport, Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB
Application number, filing date00107179.410.07.1996
[2000/30]
Priority number, dateKR1995002019810.07.1995         Original published format: KR 9520198
KR1995002019910.07.1995         Original published format: KR 9520199
KR1995003791926.10.1995         Original published format: KR 9537919
KR1996000646512.03.1996         Original published format: KR 9606465
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1022910
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1022910
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1022910
Date:05.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/26, H04N7/30
[2000/49]
Former International [2000/30]H04N7/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/34]
Former [2000/30]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verschiebung eines Bildobjektgitters[2002/13]
English:Method and apparatus for moving an object image grid[2002/13]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour déplacer une grille d'image d'objets[2002/13]
Former [2000/30]Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verschiebung eines Bildobjektgitters, und entsprechendes Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bewegungsschätzung
Former [2000/30]Method and apparatus for moving an object image grid, and motion estimation method and apparatus
Former [2000/30]Procédé et méthode pour déplacer une grille d'image d'objets, et procédé et méthode d'estimation de mouvement associé
Examination procedure11.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
17.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2002Fee for grant paid
09.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96922276.9  / EP0781492
Opposition(s)06.11.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
17.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0575202  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-24 * abstract *;
 [A]US4833543  (VERBIEST WILLEM J A [BE]) [A] 1-24 * abstract *