Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046809

EP1046809 - Fluid metering device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.06.2006
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.06.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.07.2006  [2006/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kappel, Andreas, Dr.
Zugspitzstrasse 7
85649 Brunnthal / DE
02 / Fischer, Bernhard
Paracelsusstrasse 6
84513 Töging am Inn / DE
03 / Gottlieb, Bernhard, Dr.
Elfenstrasse 16
81739 München / DE
04 / Mock, Randolf, Dr.
Ludwig-Erhard-Allee
81739 München / DE
05 / Chemisky, Eric
Josef-Wiesbergerstrasse 14
85540 Haar / DE
06 / Meixner, Hans, Prof.
Max-Planck-Strasse 5
85540 Haar / DE
[2000/43]
Application number, filing date00107401.205.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateDE199911783920.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19917839
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046809
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1046809
Date:18.06.2003
[2003/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046809
Date:10.08.2005
Language:DE
[2005/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:F02M51/06, F02M61/08, F02M61/16
[2003/12]
Former International [2000/43]F02M51/06, F02M61/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/11]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fluiddosiervorrichtung[2000/43]
English:Fluid metering device[2000/43]
French:Dispositif de dosage d'un fluide[2000/43]
Examination procedure07.07.2003Examination requested  [2003/36]
18.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2005Fee for grant paid
06.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/29]
Request for further processing for:27.05.2004Request for further processing filed
27.05.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
11.06.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
19.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH07158534  ;
 [X]DE4141274  (SOBKOVCIK FRANTISEK [CS]) [X] 1,3-8,10,11,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE1142257  (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) [X] 1,2,4,6-11,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0400846  (NUPRO CO [US]) [X] 1,4,6-11,14 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5630444  (CALLAGHAN DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0750148  (FUJIKIN KK [JP]) [X] 1,5-8,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE1038360  (ANDRE SAVARY) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5113108  (YAMASHITA OSAMU [JP], et al) [Y] 8,9 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE19838862  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 17 * the whole document *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, [X] 1-11,14-16,18 * abstract * [Y] 8,9,17
ExaminationDE591559
 GB292587
 US5205492
 DE1036575