Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028137

EP1028137 - Polymeric matrices and their uses in pharmaceutical compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2003/11]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [2003/10]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis Pharma GmbH
Brunner Strasse 59
1235 Vienna / AT
Former [2001/32]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Former [2000/33]For:BE  CH  DE  DK  ES  FR  GB  GR  IE  IT  LI  LU  NL  PT  SE 
Novartis AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
For:AT 
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H.
Brunner Strasse 59
1230 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Acemoglu, Murat
Mittlere Strasse 31
4056 Basel / CH
02 / Bantle, Siegfried
Schwarzackerstrasse 37
4411 Seltisberg / CH
03 / Bodmer, David
Rotenweg 8
5313 Klingnau / CH
04 / Cammisuli, Salvatore
loc. Venino 5
16030 Moneglia / IT
05 / Hiestand, Peter
Schonenbuchstrasse 13A
4123 Allschwil / CH
06 / Nimmerfall, Fritz
Asterhagstrasse 17
4103 Bottmingen / CH
07 / Stoll, Georg
Sundgauallee 59
79110 Freiburg / DE
[2000/41]
Former [2000/33]01 / Acemoglu, Murat
Mittlere Strasse 31
4056 Basel / CH
02 / Bantle, Siegfried
Untertalweg 6
4144 Arlesheim / CH
03 / Bodmer, David
Rotenweg 8
5313 Klingnau / CH
04 / Cammisuli, Salvatore
Ahornstrasse 2
4153 Reinach / CH
05 / Hiestand, Peter
Schonenbuchstrasse 13A
4123 Allschwil / CH
06 / Nimmerfall, Fritz
Asterhagstrasse 17
4103 Bottmingen / CH
07 / Stoll, Georg
Sundgauallee 59
79110 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date00107410.326.08.1994
[2000/33]
Priority number, dateGB1993001782227.08.1993         Original published format: GB 9317822
GB1993002024001.10.1993         Original published format: GB 9320240
GB1993002590017.12.1993         Original published format: GB 9325900
GB1994000715611.04.1994         Original published format: GB 9407156
[2000/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1028137
Date:16.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1028137
Date:02.11.2000
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08G64/02, C08G64/34, C08G64/18, A61K38/20, A61K9/16, A61K9/20
[2000/44]
Former International [2000/33]C08G64/02, C08G64/18, A61K38/20, A61K9/16, A61K9/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/33]
TitleGerman:Polymermatrize und ihre Verwendung in pharmazeutischen Zusammensetzungen[2000/33]
English:Polymeric matrices and their uses in pharmaceutical compositions[2000/33]
French:Matrices polymères et leurs utilisations dans des compositions pharmaceutiques[2000/33]
Examination procedure21.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
29.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/07]
16.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/07]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94926894.0  / EP0719295
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
05.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
05.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
05.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
05.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 08
09.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200411   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3953383  (INOUE SHOHEI, et al) [X] 1-8 * example 2; claims 1-7 *;
 [X]US3585168  (INOUE SHOHEI, et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 10; example 13; claims 1-4 *;
 [DA]  - TAKEO KAWAGUCHI ET AL, "Examination of biodegradability of poly(ethylene carbonate) and poly(propylene carbonate) in the peritoneal cavity in rats", CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, TOKYO JP, (1983), vol. 31, no. 4, pages 1400 - 1403, XP000939050 [DA] 1 * the whole document *