blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1048881 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1048881



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 186
25.10.2006 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.11.2005 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.10.2005 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 4
25.10.2005 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
25.10.2005 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
28.06.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.06.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
28.06.2005 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
21.06.2005 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2005 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.06.2005 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
25.02.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.02.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.02.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
07.02.2005 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
14.10.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.08.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
14.08.2004 Description Search / examination 7
14.08.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
14.08.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
14.08.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
14.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
13.08.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 31
09.06.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.06.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.02.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
13.02.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.03.2003 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
13.01.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
25.11.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
25.11.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.11.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
05.03.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
04.03.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.02.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 12
08.02.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
01.09.2000 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.04.2000 Priority document Search / examination 14
07.04.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 5
07.04.2000 Description Search / examination 10
07.04.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.04.2000 Drawings Search / examination 2
07.04.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7