blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1048881 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP00107526 EP05020535 EP05020536



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1617121Global Dossier 07.05.2008A3
EP1617121 18.01.2006A2
Priority number Date
EP00107526 07.04.2000
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1607668Global Dossier 07.05.2008A3
EP1607668 21.12.2005A2
Priority number Date
EP00107526 07.04.2000
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE10014560 24.01.2002C2
DE10014560 11.10.2001A1
Priority number Date
DE10014560 23.03.2000
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE20022457U 18.10.2001U1
Priority number Date
DE20022457 07.04.2000
EP00107526 07.04.2000
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE50011882D 26.01.2006D1
Priority number Date
DE50011882 07.04.2000
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6354332 12.03.2002B1
Priority number Date
DE10014560 23.03.2000
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3416772BGlobal Dossier 16.06.2003B2
JP2000337572 05.12.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1048881Global Dossier 21.12.2005B1
EP1048881 08.01.2003A3
EP1048881 02.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT313751T 15.01.2006T
Priority number Date
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR0002258 07.11.2000A
Priority number Date
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19919715 02.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2253152T 01.06.2006T3
Priority number Date
DE19919715 30.04.1999
TypeType Divisional application
 EP1617121
 EP1607668