blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1048881

Designated contracting states ATLapse: 07.04.2006
 BELapse: 30.04.2006
 CHLapse: 30.04.2006
CYLapse: 21.12.2005
 DE 
 DKLapse: 21.03.2006
 ES 
 FILapse: 21.12.2005
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 21.03.2006
 IELapse: 21.12.2005
 IT 
 LILapse: 30.04.2006
 LULapse: 07.04.2006
 MCLapse: 30.04.2006
 NLLapse: 21.12.2005
 PTLapse: 22.05.2006
 SELapse: 21.03.2006
Examination procedure21.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted21.12.2005
Opposition procedure22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 29.11.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:02.11.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:02.11.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:17.04.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:WITZENMANN GMBH
 
Event date:08.01.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:08.01.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:21.05.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20030325
 
Event date:24.09.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:31.03.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040213
 
Event date:21.12.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20051221
 
Event date:21.12.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20051221
 
Event date:21.12.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20051221
 
Event date:21.12.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:21.12.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:30.12.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:25.01.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:26.01.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:50011882
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060126
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:21.03.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20060321
 
Event date:21.03.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20060321
 
Event date:21.03.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20060321
 
Event date:07.04.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060407
 
Event date:12.04.2006 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20060322
 
Event date:30.04.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060430
 
Event date:30.04.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060430
 
Event date:30.04.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060430
 
Event date:30.04.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060430
 
Event date:22.05.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20060522
 
Event date:01.06.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2253152 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:01.06.2006 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT
 
Event date:26.07.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:01.09.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:29.11.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060922
 
Event date:15.12.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:25.04.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20070425
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:24.11.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20070425
Year of Fee Payment:08
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:WITZENMANN G.M.B.H.
Effective DATE:20060430
 
Event date:31.07.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20060407
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20051221
 
Event date:24.12.2008 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20080407
 
Event date:26.06.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20080408
 
Event date:30.06.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080407
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20080408
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20090420
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20090428
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.08.2010 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20100423
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:21.01.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20101230
 
Event date:31.01.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100430
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20100407
 
Event date:31.10.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 50011882 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:01.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 50011882 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:28.06.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20111031