Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048881

EP1048881 - Refrigerant line for air conditioners [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 07.01.2009  [2009/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Witzenmann GmbH
Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 134
75175 Pforzheim / DE
[2002/16]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Witzenmann GmbH Metallschlauch-Fabrik Pforzheim
Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 134
D-75175 Pforzheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Burkhardt, Carlo, Dr.
Schönblickstrasse 42
75331 Grunbach / DE
02 / Bantscheff, Richard
Heumahde 2
75233 Tiefenbronn / DE
03 / Heil, Bernhard
Feldbergstrasse 4
76316 Malsch / DE
04 / Kowalewsky, Kai
Schwarzwaldstrasse 12
71292 Friolsheim / DE
05 / Picard, Frank
Gartenstrasse 60
63110 Rodgau / DE
06 / Rettkowski, Klaus
Jahnstrasse 9
75433 Maulbronn / DE
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Blumenröhr, Dietrich , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/16]Blumenröhr, Dietrich , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner, Postfach 11 08 47
76058 Karlsruhe / DE
Former [2000/44]Lemcke, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47
76058 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date00107526.607.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateDE199911971530.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19919715
[2000/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048881
Date:02.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048881
Date:08.01.2003
[2003/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048881
Date:21.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16L11/15
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Kältemittelleitung für Klimaanlagen[2000/44]
English:Refrigerant line for air conditioners[2000/44]
French:Conduite de produit réfrigérant pour conditionneurs d'air[2000/44]
Examination procedure25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
13.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2005Fee for grant paid
21.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05020535.0  / EP1617121
EP05020536.8  / EP1607668
Opposition(s)22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
24.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
26.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY21.12.2005
FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
AT07.04.2006
LU07.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
CH30.04.2006
LI30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
[2009/02]
Former [2008/36]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
AT07.04.2006
LU07.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
CH30.04.2006
LI30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2007/45]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
AT07.04.2006
BE30.04.2006
CH30.04.2006
LI30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2007/35]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
IT21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
BE30.04.2006
CH30.04.2006
LI30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2007/28]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
BE30.04.2006
CH30.04.2006
LI30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2007/08]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
CH30.04.2006
LI30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2007/07]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
MC30.04.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/51]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
DK21.03.2006
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/48]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
PT22.05.2006
Former [2006/45]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
NL21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/40]FI21.12.2005
IE21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/38]FI21.12.2005
GR21.03.2006
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/27]FI21.12.2005
SE21.03.2006
Former [2006/23]FI21.12.2005
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE2705361  (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) [X] 1,4-6,8,14,15 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraphs 1,3 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4; figures 1,6 * [Y] 2,3,7,9-11,17,18,20,22;
 [YA]DE9420527U  (JESCHKE IMMANUEL [DE]) [Y] 2,3,17,18,20,22 * page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 2 - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 4,5 * [A] 16;
 [Y]DE2734983  (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) [Y] 7 * page 3, paragraph 3; figure 1; claim 5 *;
 [YA]US3420553  (POXON ALAN, et al) [Y] 9-11 * column 2, line 1 - line 52; figure 3 * [A] 12,18;
 [A]DE19749252  (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]) [A] 2,8,16 * column 4, line 64 - line 68 * * column 6, line 15 - line 62; figures 1-6; claim 7 *;
 [A]US5089074  (WINTER JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 9-12 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 8; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]DE3742195  (WITZENMANN METALLSCHLAUCHFAB [DE]) [A] 12,13 * abstract *;
 [A]DE3506626  (KATAYAMA KOGYO [JP]) [A] 16 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2759141  (CASTELLI SERGIO [IT]) [A] 19-21 * page 4, line 27 - line 31 * * page 5, line 13 - line 33; figures 1-4; claims 4,5 *