Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051053

EP1051053 - Method for identifying a mobile phone user or for eavesdropping on outgoing calls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.06.2004  [2004/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
81671 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG
Mühldorfstrasse 15
D-81671 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Frick, Joachim
Bismarckstrasse 40
86391 Stadtbergen / DE
02 / Bott, Rainer
Wartaweiler Weg 3
82346 Andechs / DE
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Graf, Walter , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Graf, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date00107879.912.04.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateDE199912022203.05.1999         Original published format: DE 19920222
[2000/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1051053
Date:08.11.2000
Language:DE
[2000/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1051053
Date:25.07.2001
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051053
Date:09.07.2003
Language:DE
[2003/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/38
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/16]
Former [2000/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Identifizieren des Benutzers eines Mobiltelefons oder zum Mithören der abgehenden Gespräche[2000/45]
English:Method for identifying a mobile phone user or for eavesdropping on outgoing calls[2000/45]
French:Procédé pour identifier un utilisateur d'un téléphone mobile ou pour écouter les appels émanants[2000/45]
Examination procedure23.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
26.01.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
31.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
30.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2003Fee for grant paid
11.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
05.03.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
05.03.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5875397  (SASIN TIBERIUS ET AL) [X] 6 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 54; figures 2,4; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5483666  (OHMORI EIJI ET AL) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 1, line 38 - line 51 * * column 2, line 16 - column 4, line 63 *;
 [A]US5428667  (VOELKEL JOHN C ET AL) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 48 * * column 7, line 3 - line 33 * * column 19, line 24 - line 41 * * abstract *;
 [X]DE19651334  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [X] 6 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 7 * * column 6, line 64 - column 8, line 55; figure 21C *