blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1032080

EP1032080 - A connector [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 29.08.2007  [2007/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city
Mie 510-8503 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tabata, Masaaki, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie / JP
02 / Kawase, Hajime, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie / JP
03 / Muta, Junji, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd.
1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho
Yokkaichi-City, Mie / JP
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date00107904.530.07.1997
[2000/35]
Priority number, dateJP1996020067430.07.1996         Original published format: JP 20067496
JP1996020067130.07.1996         Original published format: JP 20067196
JP1996022286823.08.1996         Original published format: JP 22286896
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032080
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032080
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01R13/436
[2000/35]
CPC:
H01R13/4365 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   PT [2000/35]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Steckverbinder[2000/35]
English:A connector[2000/35]
French:Connecteur électrique[2000/35]
Examination procedure27.04.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
25.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2002Fee for grant paid
18.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97113117.2  / EP0827236
Opposition(s)10.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.10.2002
IT09.10.2002
PT09.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
[2007/35]
Former [2006/14]FR09.10.2002
PT09.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2004/04]PT09.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2003/29]PT09.01.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0389955  (YAZAKI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 4, line 26 - line 39 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 54 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0600469  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,3,5-7 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 42 * * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 5 * * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]FR2702889  (CINCH CONNECTEURS SA [FR]) [A] 1,4 * page 10, line 10 - page 11, line 5 * * figures 15-17 *;
 [A]EP0251518  (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 10 * column 3, line 35 - column 4, line 5 * * figures 3,4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.