Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046927

EP1046927 - Traffic Monitoring apparatus for measuring the speed of a passing vehicle by means of a radar device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/43]Radar sensor or measuring device
[2004/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBOT Visual Systems GmbH
Opladener Strasse 202
40789 Monheim / DE
[2004/42]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
ROBOT FOTO UND ELECTRONIC GmbH
Hildener Strasse 57
D-40597 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Luenne, Peter
Haselnussecke 24
30890 Barsinghausen / DE
02 / Kuester, Hans-Holger
Ostdeutsche Strasse 24
31061 Alfeld / DE
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Weisse, Jürgen , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Jürgen Weisse, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Ing. Renate Weisse, Bökenbusch 41
42555 Velbert / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Phys. Jürgen Weisse, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Ing. Renate Weisse, Bökenbusch 41
42555 Velbert / DE
Application number, filing date00108003.519.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateDE199911797021.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19917970
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1046927
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1046927
Date:08.05.2002
[2002/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046927
Date:08.09.2004
Language:DE
[2004/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/87, G01S7/03, G01S7/28, G01S13/92
[2004/16]
Former International [2000/43]G01S13/87, G01S7/03, G01S7/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:Verkehrsüberwachungs-Anlage zur Messung der Geschwindigkeit eines vorbeifahrenden Fahrzeugs mittels eines Radargerätes[2004/16]
English:Traffic Monitoring apparatus for measuring the speed of a passing vehicle by means of a radar device[2004/16]
French:Appareil de surveillance du traffic pour mesurer la vitesse d'un véhicule passant en utilisant un dispositif de Radar[2004/16]
Former [2000/43]Radarsensor oder -messgerät
Former [2000/43]Radar sensor or measuring device
Former [2000/43]Dispositif de mesure ou capteur radar
Examination procedure08.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/02]
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2004Fee for grant paid
22.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
IT08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
PT08.02.2005
AT19.04.2005
CY19.04.2005
LU19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
IT08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
AT19.04.2005
CY19.04.2005
LU19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/27]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
AT19.04.2005
CY19.04.2005
LU19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/26]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
AT19.04.2005
CY19.04.2005
LU19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2007/20]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
AT19.04.2005
CY19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2007/08]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
AT19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2006/43]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
AT19.04.2005
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/31]FI08.09.2004
FR08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/25]FI08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
BE30.04.2005
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2006/14]FI08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
NL08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
CH30.04.2005
LI30.04.2005
Former [2005/46]FI08.09.2004
GB08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
DK08.12.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
Former [2005/27]FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
ES19.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI08.09.2004
IE08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/18]FI08.09.2004
GR08.12.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/11]FI08.09.2004
SE08.12.2004
Former [2005/10]SE08.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5248975  (SCHUTZ ALAN E [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 32 - line 44 * [A] 3,4
ExaminationUS5262783