Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046548

EP1046548 - Knee protection device in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 20
73553 Alfdorf / DE
[2000/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Freisler, Werner
Zeppelinstrasse 47
89551 Königsbronn / DE
02 / Kleinmann, Bernd
Mühlwiesenstrasse 8
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
03 / Schultz, Dirk
Ostlandstrasse 20
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
04 / Zischka, Gerd
Bruckertalstrasse 16
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
05 / Bernhard, Klaus
Lindestrasse 4
73565 Spraitbach / DE
06 / Mohr, Robert
Strümpfelbachstrasse 68
71384 Weinstadt / DE
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Kitzhofer, Thomas , et al
Prinz & Partner GbR
Rundfunkplatz 2
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7
81241 München / DE
Application number, filing date00108007.619.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateDE1999207163U22.04.1999         Original published format: DE 29907163 U
[2000/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046548
Date:25.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046548
Date:11.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/045
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/29]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Knie-Rückhalteeinrichtung für Fahrzeuge[2000/43]
English:Knee protection device in a vehicle[2000/43]
French:Dispositif de protection des genoux dans un véhicule[2000/43]
Examination procedure14.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
26.04.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.08.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT
11.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2003Fee for grant paid
09.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
01.06.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
01.06.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE11.09.2003
[2004/10]
Documents cited:Search[A]US4662649  (IKEDA HIDEKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * figure - * * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 24 *;
 [A]JPH08216816  ;
 [A]JPH02200547  ;
 [A]JPH01141145  ;
 [A]JPH08175302  ;
 [A]JPH0632195
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901025), vol. 014, no. 491, Database accession no. (M - 1040), [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890905), vol. 013, no. 398, Database accession no. (M - 866), [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940511), vol. 018, no. 245, Database accession no. (M - 1603), [A] 1,2,4-8,10,11,15,18 * abstract *
by applicantEP0872388