Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048457

EP1048457 - Lithographic printing plate precursor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma
Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.
210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi
Kanagawa 250-01 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oohashi, Hidekazu
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP
02 / Yamasaki, Sumiaki
Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri
Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date00108087.825.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateJP1999011829526.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11829599
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048457
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048457
Date:26.06.2002
[2002/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048457
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:B41C1/10, B41M5/36
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:Lithographische Druckplattenvorstufe[2000/44]
English:Lithographic printing plate precursor[2000/44]
French:Précurseur de plaque d'impression lithographique[2000/44]
Examination procedure10.09.2002Examination requested  [2002/46]
20.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2004Fee for grant paid
15.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
21.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
IT15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY25.04.2005
IE25.04.2005
LU25.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
PT15.05.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/35]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
IT15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY25.04.2005
IE25.04.2005
LU25.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/27]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY25.04.2005
IE25.04.2005
LU25.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/26]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY25.04.2005
IE25.04.2005
LU25.04.2005
Former [2007/20]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
CY25.04.2005
IE25.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2007/08]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
SE15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
IE25.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2006/32]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
FR15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
IE25.04.2005
Former [2006/25]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
IE25.04.2005
Former [2006/14]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
NL15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2006/12]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
DK15.03.2005
GR15.03.2005
ES26.03.2005
Former [2005/51]AT15.12.2004
BE15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/36]AT15.12.2004
CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/26]CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
GR15.03.2005
Former [2005/25]CH15.12.2004
FI15.12.2004
LI15.12.2004
Former [2005/24]FI15.12.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0867769  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 52 * * page 16, line 16 - line 22 * * page 16, line 39 - line 43 * * page 22, line 15 - line 30 * * claims 1,2,5 *;
 [X]EP0874282  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 7 - line 11 * * page 3, line 45 - page 5, line 30 * * page 41, line 1 - line 45 * * page 48, line 33 - line 39 * * page 48, line 56 - page 49, line 4 * * page 54, line 50 - line 55 * * page 57, line 25 - line 35 * * page 61, line 15 - line 25 * * claims 11,19,20 *;
 [X]EP0822067  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 34 - line 47 * * page 4, line 18 - line 56 * * page 5, line 9 - line 15 * * examples 2,4; claims 1,2,8 *;
 [X]US5705308  (WEST PAUL RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 22 * * example 1; claim 1 *