Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1057558

EP1057558 - Vacuum die pressure casting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/49]Prevention of oxidation of the melt in a vacuum die casting machine
[2004/29]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Müller Weingarten AG
Schussenstrasse 11
88250 Weingarten / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/49]For all designated states
Müller Weingarten AG
Schussenstrasse 11
D-88250 Weingarten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stummer, Friedrich Georg, Dipl.-Ing.
Ginsterweg 5
70736 Fellbach / DE
02 / Schwab, Wilfried
Brahmsweg 3
88250 Weingarten / DE
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte
Grosstobeler Strasse 39
88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/39]Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler
Patentanwälte Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Former [2000/49]Patentanwälte Eisele, Otten & Roth
Karlstrasse 8
88212 Ravensburg / DE
Application number, filing date00108213.014.04.2000
[2000/49]
Priority number, dateDE199912514802.06.1999         Original published format: DE 19925148
[2000/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1057558
Date:06.12.2000
Language:DE
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1057558
Date:01.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B22D17/14, B22D18/06, B22D17/30
[2000/49]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [2001/34]
Former [2000/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Nach einem Vakuumverfahren arbeitende Druckgiessmaschine[2004/29]
English:Vacuum die pressure casting machine[2004/29]
French:Machine à coulée sous vide sous pression[2004/29]
Former [2000/49]Verhinderung der Oxidation der Schmelze bei einer nach einem Vakuumverfahren arbeitenden Druckgiessmaschine
Former [2000/49]Prevention of oxidation of the melt in a vacuum die casting machine
Former [2000/49]Prévention de l'oxydation du métal liquide dans une machine de coulée à dépression
Examination procedure31.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/14]
08.10.2003Observations by third parties
27.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2004Fee for grant paid
17.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5263531  (DRURY PAUL E [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5246055  (FIELDS JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 13, line 25 - column 15, line 47; figure 6 *;
 [A]EP0790090  (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *