EP1059476 - Agricultural balling press with an hydraulic system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/50] | Hydraulic system with an electric pressure reducing valve | ||
[2005/01] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Usines Claas France Route de Thionville 57050 Metz Woippy / FR | [2000/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegert, Ralf Kaller Strasse 9 49849 Wilsum / DE | 02 /
Berkemann, Stephan Auf der Töterlöh 8 33100 Paderborn / DE | 03 /
Roth, Arséne 57, Faubourg des Perrières 70100 Arc les Gray / FR | 04 /
Guthmann, Peter 14, rue de Wilson 57000 Metz / FR | [2000/50] | Representative(s) | Roth, Klaus Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Roth, Klaus Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2003/34] | Kus, Sascha c/o CLAAS KGaA mbH Patentabteilung Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | ||
Former [2002/35] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/50] | Weeg, Thomas Claas KGaA, Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Application number, filing date | 00108219.7 | 14.04.2000 | [2000/50] | Priority number, date | DE1999126243 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: DE 19926243 | [2000/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1059476 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1059476 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1059476 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/06, F16K31/08, F16K31/06, F15B11/028, F15B20/00, A01B71/00, A01F15/08 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
F16K31/0658 (EP);
A01B71/00 (EP);
A01F15/0833 (EP);
F15B11/028 (EP);
F15B20/002 (EP);
F15B2211/20538 (EP);
F15B2211/30505 (EP);
F15B2211/40515 (EP);
F15B2211/41509 (EP);
F15B2211/455 (EP);
F15B2211/50536 (EP);
F15B2211/5153 (EP);
F15B2211/526 (EP);
F15B2211/55 (EP);
F15B2211/6313 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | F16K17/06, F16K31/08, F16K31/06, F15B11/028, F15B20/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/50] | F16K17/06, F16K31/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Ballenpresse mit einem Hydrauliksystem | [2005/01] | English: | Agricultural balling press with an hydraulic system | [2005/01] | French: | Presse à balles agricole avec un système hydraulique | [2005/01] |
Former [2000/50] | Hydrauliksystem mit elektrischem Druckbegrenzungsventil | ||
Former [2000/50] | Hydraulic system with an electric pressure reducing valve | ||
Former [2000/50] | Système hydraulique avec une soupape électrique de limitation de pression | Examination procedure | 18.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2006
08.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US Opponent's representative Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.02.2006
08.03.2006
ADMISSIBLE Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US Opponent's representative Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | 05.04.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.08.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.10.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 08.10.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/12] | 08.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 14.01.2009 | Appeal received No. T0180/09 | 14.01.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.10.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 08.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | GB | 01.06.2005 | IE | 01.06.2005 | IT | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | PT | 07.11.2005 | AT | 14.04.2006 | LU | 14.04.2006 | CH | 30.04.2006 | ES | 30.04.2006 | LI | 30.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | [2009/29] |
Former [2009/02] | CY | 01.06.2005 | |
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
AT | 14.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
AT | 14.04.2006 | ||
LU | 14.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/46] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
AT | 14.04.2006 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
IT | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.04.2006 | ||
LI | 30.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
IE | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
GB | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3531080 (DILLON LEO H) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 5 * * column 4, line 71 - line 73 * * column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 14; figure 1 *; | [X]US3684238 (MICHELLONE GIAN CARLO, et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US4070928 (VON KOCH ARWED) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 33 - line 51 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE3920893 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3* column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 6 * | by applicant | DE19718229 |