Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048398

EP1048398 - Workpiece transfer apparatus with overhead actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unova IP Corp.
21900 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills
CA 91367-7418 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Unova IP Corp.
21900 Burbank Boulevard
Woodland Hills, CA 91367-7418 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McNamara, Jeffrey S.
23507 Parklane
Grosse Ile, MI 48138 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Nash, Keith Wilfrid
Nash Matthews
90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/44]Nash, Keith Wilfrid
KEITH W. NASH & Co., 90-92 Regent Street
Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB
Application number, filing date00108233.814.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateUS19990130776P23.04.1999         Original published format: US 130776 P
US1999038461227.08.1999         Original published format: US 384612
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048398
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048398
Date:05.12.2001
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B23Q7/14, B65G25/02
[2001/49]
Former International [2000/44]B23Q7/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   SE [2002/35]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Werkstücktransporteinrichtung mit oben angeordneter Antriebvorrichtung[2000/44]
English:Workpiece transfer apparatus with overhead actuator[2000/44]
French:Dispositif de transfert de pièces à usiner avec dispositif d'entraînement aérien[2000/44]
Examination procedure14.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/22]
29.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/29]
12.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US5127787  (BECK WILBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4377986  (JUVE ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US5636962  (OKADA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US2856079  (WATTER) [A] 1-12 * claim 1 *