Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1045537

EP1045537 - Method for displaying information, which is stored in a computer, in particular for application in a moving vehicle, where supplementary information is transmitted via digital broadcast [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  29.11.2013
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2013Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect publishedpublished on 01.01.2014  [2014/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Trend Network AG
Graf-Adolf-Strasse 100
40210 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Suhr, Steffen
Wielandstrasse 113
D - 44791 Bochum / DE
02 / Michael Möller
Unter den Eichen 55
D - 40625 Düsseldorf / DE
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date00108333.614.04.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateDE199911740216.04.1999         Original published format: DE 19917402
[2000/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1045537
Date:18.10.2000
Language:DE
[2000/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1045537
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1045537
Date:25.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP26.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/00
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Vorführen von Informationen, die in einem Computer gespeichert sind, insbesondere für Anwendung in einem bewegten Fahrzeug, wobei Zusatzinformationen über den digitalen Rundfunk übertragen werden[2000/42]
English:Method for displaying information, which is stored in a computer, in particular for application in a moving vehicle, where supplementary information is transmitted via digital broadcast[2000/42]
French:Méthode pour l'affichage d'informations qui sont stockées dans un ordinateur, en particulier pour l'application dans une automobile, ou des informations supplémentaires sont transmises par transmission numérique[2000/42]
Examination procedure14.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
29.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
14.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
14.03.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
24.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2001Fee for grant paid
23.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP01108434.0  / EP1126642
EP01108435.7  / EP1130832
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.10.2001  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
 02  24.04.2002  05.06.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Akers, Noel James
Howrey Simon Arnold & White
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9HS / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2002/25]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2001  30.04.2002  ADMISSIBLE
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
 02  24.04.2002   
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Opponent's representative
Akers, Noel James
Howrey Simon Arnold & White, City Point, One Ropemaker Street
London EC2V 9AW / GB
Former [2002/01]
Opponent(s)01  27.10.2001   
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
12.06.2002Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.12.2002Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.08.2013Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
24.08.2013Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2014/01]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH25.07.2001
FR25.07.2001
LI25.07.2001
MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
ES15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
GB14.04.2004
NL01.11.2004
IT14.04.2005
[2007/34]
Former [2006/23]CH25.07.2001
FR25.07.2001
LI25.07.2001
MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
ES15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
GB14.04.2004
NL01.11.2004
Former [2005/49]CH25.07.2001
FR25.07.2001
LI25.07.2001
MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
ES15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
GB14.04.2004
Former [2005/45]CH25.07.2001
LI25.07.2001
MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
ES15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
GB14.04.2004
Former [2005/16]CH25.07.2001
LI25.07.2001
MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
ES15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2005/02]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
ES15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/39]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
LU14.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/29]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
IE14.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
DK30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/28]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
BE30.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/23]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
DE01.11.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/16]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/14]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
AT14.04.2003
FI14.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
GR04.11.2003
Former [2004/13]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
FI14.04.2003
PT31.10.2003
Former [2004/12]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
FI14.04.2003
Former [2004/10]MC14.04.2002
CY30.04.2002
Former [2003/25]MC14.04.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2306857  (INFOSCREEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 26; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9724581  (INTEGRAL MEDIA SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 15; claim 1 *;
 [A]DE29708460U  (INFOSCREEN GES FUER STADTINFOR [DE]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 9; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9642144  (NOKIA OY AB [FI], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 12; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9743838  (NOKIA OY AB [FI], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 36; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9636141  (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 26; figure 1; claim 1 *
 [A]  FAZEL K ET AL, "MOBILE MULTIMEDIA SERVICES VIA DAB: DMB", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4199-6, pages 1312 - 1317, XP000737741 [A] 1 * the whole document *