Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044773

EP1044773 - Method to prepare cork for food purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Laboratorio Analisi sas di Diust & C.
Piazza Divisione Julia, 18
33040 Corno di Rosazzo (UD) / IT
[2000/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Diust, Valdino
Via Duchi d'Aosta, 9
33100 Udine / IT
02 / Battistutta, Franco
Via G. Marconi, 10
33050 Ariis (UD) / IT
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Petraz, Gilberto Luigi , et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Petraz, Gilberto , et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
Application number, filing date00108340.114.04.2000
[2000/42]
Priority number, dateIT1999UD0007916.04.1999         Original published format: IT UD990079
[2000/42]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044773
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B27K7/00
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   PT [2001/27]
Former [2000/42]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Kork für Nahrungsmittelzwecke[2000/42]
English:Method to prepare cork for food purposes[2000/42]
French:Méthode de préparation de liège à utiliser avec des produits alimentaires[2000/42]
Examination procedure11.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/24]
03.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
17.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200304   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2569369  (MONTEFLUOS SPA [IT]);
 [A]FR725939  (PELADAN AND DAUPHIN);
 [A]FR2574696  (SABATE MODESTE [FR]);
 [A]FR907518  (PRODUITS PEROXYDES SOC D);
 [A]FR2635292  (HENKEL FRANCE [FR]);
 [A]AU572470B  (CORK & SEALS PTY LTD)