Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047159

EP1047159 - Electrical switch assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.01.2008  [2008/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532 / US
Inventor(s)01 / White, Pat
26 Corrouorrin Avenue
Ennis, Co. Clare / IE
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PatentConsult
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, Alexandrastrasse 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date00108411.018.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateUS1999029824223.04.1999         Original published format: US 298242
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047159
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1047159
Date:25.07.2001
[2001/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047159
Date:27.10.2004
Language:EN
[2004/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/703, H01R13/646
[2001/30]
Former International [2000/43]H01R13/703
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/43]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Schalterbaugruppe[2000/47]
English:Electrical switch assembly[2000/43]
French:Unité à commutateur électrique[2000/43]
Former [2000/43]Zusammenbau eines elektrischen Schalters
Examination procedure27.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/04]
12.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2004Fee for grant paid
06.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.07.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
PT27.03.2005
CY18.04.2005
LU18.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
[2008/03]
Former [2007/27]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
CY18.04.2005
LU18.04.2005
MC30.04.2005
Former [2007/26]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
CY18.04.2005
LU18.04.2005
Former [2007/20]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
CY18.04.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2007/08]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
LU30.04.2005
Former [2006/14]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
NL27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/51]AT27.10.2004
BE27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
DK27.01.2005
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT27.10.2004
CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/27]CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
GR27.01.2005
ES07.02.2005
Former [2005/26]CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
GR27.01.2005
Former [2005/25]CH27.10.2004
LI27.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4398784  (TAKIHARA YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,8 * the whole document * [A] 10;
 [A]US5693924  (FETTEROLF SR JAMES RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6-8,10 * figure 11 *;
 [A]US5540603  (FUJIWARA YOSHIHITO [JP]) [A] 4-6,9 * figure 6 *