Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1047277

EP1047277 - Mobile communication terminal with a detachable IC card and method of accessing the network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Oshima, Hiroyuki, NEC Mobile Communications Ltd.
16-8, Shinyokohama 3-chome, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/43]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date00108469.818.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateJP1999011289220.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11289299
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1047277
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1047277
Date:15.11.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1047277
Date:24.08.2005
Language:EN
[2005/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/32
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/31]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mobilkommunikationsendgerät mit entfernbarer Chipkarte und Verfahren zum Netzwerkzugang[2000/43]
English:Mobile communication terminal with a detachable IC card and method of accessing the network[2000/43]
French:Terminal de communication mobile avec une carte à puce détachable et procédé pour accéder au réseau[2000/43]
Examination procedure05.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
11.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2005Fee for grant paid
09.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.05.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
30.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0607767  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE COMMUNICAT [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 48 * * page 3, line 7 - line 44 * * page 3, line 54 - page 4, line 3 *