Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1046804

EP1046804 - Cylinder head for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]For all designated states
NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED
2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Satou, Seigou
1-217, 8-8, Shirane, Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241-0005 / JP
[2000/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date00108476.318.04.2000
[2000/43]
Priority number, dateJP1999011512522.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11512599
[2000/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1046804
Date:25.10.2000
Language:EN
[2000/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1046804
Date:16.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP27.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:F02F1/24
[2000/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/29]
Former [2000/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine[2000/43]
English:Cylinder head for internal combustion engine[2000/43]
French:Culasse pour un moteur à combustion interne[2000/43]
Examination procedure18.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/43]
16.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2004Fee for grant paid
06.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
14.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0422277  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 34 - line 43; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0344597  (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 26; figure - *