blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1048699 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1048699



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 375
25.05.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.06.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.06.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.06.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 15
09.06.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 16
09.06.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.04.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
03.02.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.02.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 98
21.04.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 4
21.04.2008 Description Search / examination 9
21.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.04.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
22.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.02.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
10.10.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Claims Search / examination 23
07.06.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.06.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
10.04.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.04.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.11.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.11.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.08.2005 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 2
07.07.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.06.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 3
10.06.2003 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.04.2003 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2003 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.04.2003 European search report Search / examination 1
20.09.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Claims Search / examination 57
26.04.2000 Description Search / examination 89
26.04.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.04.2000 Drawings Search / examination 5
26.04.2000 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6