blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1048699


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.04.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2013  [2013/22]
25.05.2012 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.06.2012  [2012/26]
04.05.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2012  [2012/23]
20.01.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
17.06.2011 (Expected) grant published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
15.06.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
15.06.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.05.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
30.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.04.2008 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2008 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.10.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.05.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.06.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.05.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.04.2006 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.11.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.07.2005 Change - representative published on  24.08.2005  [2005/34]
06.05.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.05.2004 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
04.05.2004 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
09.01.2004 Definitive list of designations published on  25.02.2004  [2004/09]
31.10.2003 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2003  [2003/51]
13.05.2003 Renewal fee
18.04.2003 Publication of search report published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
17.05.2002 Renewal fee
15.09.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.11.2000 [2000/44]