blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1048699
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4458314BGlobal Dossier 28.04.2010B2
JP2001181540 03.07.2001A
Priority number Date
JP29248099 14.10.1999
JP2000125629 26.04.2000
JP11962399 27.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1048699Global Dossier 20.07.2011B1
EP1048699 04.06.2003A3
EP1048699 02.11.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP29248099 14.10.1999
JP11962399 27.04.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6503307 07.01.2003B1
Priority number Date
JP29248099 14.10.1999
JP11962399 27.04.1999