Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048699

EP1048699 - Ink set, printing method, ink, printed article, printing apparatus, ink cartridge, recording unit, and process of forming polymeric compound films [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2011/29]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Noguchi, Hiromichi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/44]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/34]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/44]Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date00108846.726.04.2000
[2000/44]
Priority number, dateJP1999011962327.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11962399
JP1999029248014.10.1999         Original published format: JP 29248099
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1048699
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1048699
Date:04.06.2003
[2003/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048699
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:C09D11/00, B41J2/01
[2000/44]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2004/09]
Former [2000/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintensatz, Druckverfahren, bedruckter Artikel, Druckvorrichtung, Tintenkassette, Aufzeichnungseinheit, und Verfahren zur Bildung von polymeren Verbundfilmen[2000/44]
English:Ink set, printing method, ink, printed article, printing apparatus, ink cartridge, recording unit, and process of forming polymeric compound films[2000/44]
French:Assortiment d'encres, procédé d'impression, encre, article imprimé, appareil d'impression, cartouche d'encre, unité d'enregistrement, et procédé de préparation de films composites polymères[2000/44]
Examination procedure16.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/51]
30.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2011Fee for grant paid
09.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2005
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
28.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 08
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 09
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 10
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 11
02.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
ES31.10.2011
[2013/22]
Former [2012/23]IT20.07.2011
NL20.07.2011
Former [2012/08]NL20.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0761783  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 53,54,77,78 * page 3, lines 36-51 * * page 12, line 3 * * page 12, lines 35-41 * * page 13, lines 15-21 *;
 [X]EP0518489  (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 53,54,77,78 * page 3, line 42 - page 4, line 54 *;
 [A]EP0832741  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 52,76 * page 5, lines 36-56 * * page 8, lines 48-53 *;
 [AD]US4613652  (NAKAYAMA TAKEO [JP], et al);
 [DA]JPS6123615  (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD);
 [DA]JPH10287035
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 02, Database accession no. 1999-017821, XP002237733 & JPH10287035 A 19981027 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [DA] * abstract *