Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1050556

EP1050556 - Oxygen scavenger compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.2007
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN.
7500 Grace Drive
Columbia, MD 21044 / US
[2006/21]
Former [2000/45]For all designated states
Cryovac, Inc.
100 Rogers Bridge Road, Building A
Duncan, S.C. 29334-0464 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hallock, John Scott
10313 Coniston Court
Potomac Maryland 20854 / US
02 / Ebner, Cynthia Louise
102 North Staghorn Lane
Greer, SC 29650 / US
[2000/45]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date00109092.703.05.2000
[2000/45]
Priority number, dateUS1999030640006.05.1999         Original published format: US 306400
[2000/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1050556
Date:08.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1050556
Date:07.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C08K3/30, C08K3/00, C08K5/19
[2000/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/45]
TitleGerman:Sauerstoff entfernende Zusammensetzung[2000/45]
English:Oxygen scavenger compositions[2000/45]
French:Composition pour éliminer l'oxygène[2000/45]
Examination procedure21.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/08]
14.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
03.03.2006Fee for grant paid
03.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20]
Request for further processing for:03.03.2006Request for further processing filed
03.03.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.03.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
13.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
CY07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
[2009/37]
Former [2008/19]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
GR08.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/35]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
IT07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/13]AT07.06.2006
BE07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/12]AT07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
PT07.11.2006
Former [2007/03]AT07.06.2006
CH07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
LI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
Former [2006/52]AT07.06.2006
FI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
Former [2006/51]FI07.06.2006
SE07.09.2006
Former [2006/48]SE07.09.2006
Documents cited:Search   [] - No relevant documents disclosed